Geberit board of directors
WebFounded in 1874, Geberit has grown from a small plumbing business into a listed sanitary group of international renown. EN. Download Center. Group. Company. Mission & Strategy ... New Chairman of the Board of Directors. Günter F. Kelm steps down as Chairman of the Board of Directors. At the General Meeting, Albert M. Baehny is elected his ... WebThe Board of Directors of Geberit AG has appointed Karl Spachmann as Head of the Group Division Sales Europe, effective April 1, 2011. The Organization Regulations of the Board of Directors regulate the duties and powers of the Board of Directors as a governing body, of the Chairman, the Vice Chairman and Lead Directors and the …
Geberit board of directors
Did you know?
WebThe main compliance activities for Geberit encompass the areas antitrust legislation ( GRI 206 ), corruption ( GRI 205 ), data protection ( GRI 418 ), product liability ( GRI 416, GRI 417 ), fundamental employee rights ( Communication on Progress Principles UNGC 1-6) as well as environment, health and safety ( GRI 307, GRI 403 ). WebDirectors Map Geberit India Manufacturing Private Limited is a Private incorporated on 26 August 2010. It is classified as Subsidiary of Foreign Company and is registered at Registrar of Companies, Pune. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 65,000,000 and its paid up capital is Rs. 56,875,432.
WebThe Board of Directors of Geberit AG will propose a dividend of CHF 6.40 at the General Meeting on April 30, 2010, corresponding to an increase of 18.5%. This amount consists, on the one hand, of a normal dividend of CHF 5.40, which corresponds to a dividend rate of 53.3%. This value is thus above the 30%-50% range WebAt the ordinary General Meeting on 14 April 2024, Thomas Bachmann was elected as a new member of the Board of Directors at Geberit AG, replacing Hartmut Reuter who did not stand for re-election. Eunice Zehnder-Lai (Chair), Thomas Bachmann and Werner Karlen were elected to the Nomination and Compensation Committee.
WebSusanne Ruoff has decided to step down from the Board of Directors at Geberit AG as of the next General Meeting in April 2013. Due to scheduling conflicts, she will now concentrate fully on her new position as CEO at … WebDownloads - Geberit Annual Report 2024 Home Downloads Download Center Full Annual Report 2024 Annual Report Archive All Excel tables Business Report Financials Sustainability Interested in an in-depth look behind the scenes of Geberit with gripping stories and photos? Then order our annual chronicle. Order Geberit chronicle
WebThe Board of Directors of Geberit AG has appointed Tobias Knechtle as the new Head of Group Executive Area Finance (CFO) and as a member of the Group Executive Board with effect from 1 January 2024. Tobias Knechtle joined the company on 1 November 2024 and replaces Roland Iff, who retired at the end of 2024 following 17 years as CFO at Geberit.
WebThe globally operating Geberit Group is a European leader in the field of sanitary products. We operate with a strong local presence in most European countries, providing unique added value when it comes to sanitary technology and bathroom ceramics. ... The Board of Directors is composed of six independent members, the operational management ... fülöp attila bodajkWebEmployees, Management and Board of Directors of the Geberit Group together are holding 1.1% of the shares. Information on significant shareholders can be found on the website of SIX Swiss Exchange Significant Shareholders. Please fill in “Geberit“ in the corresponding search field “company”. Share register Send an email to the Share Register. fülzúgásraWebHartmut Reuter will not be standing for re-election at the ordinary General Meeting in 2024 after 13 years on the Board of Directors of Geberit AG. Within the context of succession planning, the Geberit AG Board of Directors will nominate Thomas Bachmann as a new member of the Board of Directors. fülzúgásra gyógyszerWebThe Board of Directors is composed of six non-executive, independent members. EN. Download Center. Group. Company. Mission & Strategy ... field. Most of them have been with the company for many years, and they are all fully behind the corporate culture at … Member of the Group Executive Board since January 2024 With Geberit since … At Geberit he was Head of Group Executive Area Marketing and Sales Europe from … Member of the Group Executive Board since 2015 With Geberit since 2009 … Member of the Group Executive Board since 2015 With Geberit since 2015 … Citizen of Switzerland and Hong Kong Member of the Board of Directors DKSH … Swiss citizen Various mandates as independent board member as well as … Member of the Group Executive Board since 2024 With Geberit since 1995 … Member of the Group Executive Board since 2016 With Geberit since 2011 … Swiss citizen Chairman of the Board of Directors Globalance Bank AG, Zurich … From 2002 to 2009, he was COO at Phoenix Mecano AG in Kloten (CH) and, … fülöp attila operaénekesWebBoard of Directors: remuneration and share ownership in 2024 This section is audited by the external auditor. The remuneration of the Board of Directors consists solely of a fixed remuneration paid out in the form of cash and non-discounted restricted shares. attic jakkeWebChairman of the Board of Directors of Geberit AG (since 2011) Former Activities and Functions CEO ad interim of Lonza Group Ltd (2024–2024) CEO of Geberit Group (2005–2014) Head of Group Division Marketing … attic japanWebBoard of Directors: remuneration and share ownership in 2024 This section is audited by the external auditor. The remuneration of the Board of Directors consists solely of a fixed remuneration paid out in the form of cash and non-discounted restricted shares. attic hotel kanpur